Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Steven J Stankiewicz, filed a(n) Lemon Law case represented by Jacqueline C Herritt, against Ford Motor Company, represented by Megan C Pear, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
CategoryLemon Law |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 |
TRIAL
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
October 02, 2023 |
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | General Correspondence submitted by Court | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Trial" Proceeding for CPM-L-000447-22 has been scheduled for 10/23/2023. | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Settlement Conference" Proceeding for CPM-L-000447-22 has been scheduled for 10/02/2023. | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DE NOVO TRIAL submitted by HERRITT, JACQUELINE, C of KIMMEL & SILVERMAN, PC on behalf of STEVEN J STANKIEWICZ against FORD MOTOR COMPANY | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award submitted by Court | |
July 13, 2023 | ARBITRATION HEARING | ||
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter Memorandum submitted by Court | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.