Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Laurie A Grimley, Robert J Grimley, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Roman Rabinovich, against Certain Underwritersat Lloyds, represented by Brian Francis Breen, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2022 |
CategoryOther Insurance Claim (Including Declaratory Judgment Actions) |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court Without Prejudice |
This complaint is filed by Robert John Grimley and Laurie Alida Grimley, individually and as trustees of the Robert John Grimley and Laurie Alida Grimley Revocable Trust, against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. The plaintiffs allege that they...
DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 10, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 15, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20232353327] | |
September 08, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DISMISSAL-Granted by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20232277890] | |
August 25, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DISMISSAL
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by MCCARTNEY, ALYSSA, F of WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ ET AL LLP on behalf of CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, SUBSCRIBING TO THE CERTIF against ROBERT J GRIMLEY, LAURIE A GRIMLEY | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY submitted by BREEN, BRIAN, FRANCIS of WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ ET AL LLP on behalf of CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, SUBSCRIBING TO THE CERTIF against ROBERT J GRIMLEY, LAURIE A GRIMLEY | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 08/16/2023 will be decided on 09/08/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20232353327] | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 08/07/2023 will be decided on 08/25/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20232277890] | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISMISSAL submitted by BREEN, BRIAN, FRANCIS of WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ ET AL LLP on behalf of CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, SUBSCRIBING TO THE CERTIF against ROBERT J GRIMLEY, LAURIE A GRIMLEY | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.