Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
C3 Middle Township Llc, filed a(n) Actions In Lieu Of Prerogative Writs case represented by Rahool Patel, against Insa Middle Township, Llc, Sweetspot Garden State Llc, Township Of Middle, represented by Charles Joseph Messina, Keith Alan Davis, Maurice Maley, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with Michael J Blee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2022 |
CategoryActions In Lieu Of Prerogative Writs |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 02, 2022Order Show Cause(Setting Hearing Date)-GRANTED by Judge MICHAEL J BLEE
Date: November 04, 2022Order Show Cause - DENIED by Judge BLEE, MICHAEL, J
Date: December 16, 2022Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge BLEE, MICHAEL, J
Date: December 09, 2022Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge BLEE, MICHAEL, J
Date: December 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by PATEL, RAHOOL of ANSELL GRIMM & AARON PC on behalf of C3 MIDDLE TOWNSHIP LLC against TOWNSHIP OF MIDDLE, INSA MIDDLE TOWNSHIP, LLC, SWEETSPOT GARDEN STATE LLC | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Show Cause - DENIED by Judge BLEE, MICHAEL, J | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge BLEE, MICHAEL, J | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FARRELL, STEPHANIE, E of NEHMAD DAVIS & GOLDSTEIN, P.C. on behalf of INSA MIDDLE TOWNSHIP, LLC against C3 MIDDLE TOWNSHIP LLC, TOWNSHIP OF MIDDLE, SWEETSPOT GARDEN STATE LLC | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by SHEEHAN, KENNETH, JAMES of GENOVA BURNS LLC on behalf of SWEETSPOT GARDEN STATE LLC against C3 MIDDLE TOWNSHIP LLC | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer submitted by SIMONE, ERIN, ELIZABETH of MALEY GIVENS PC on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF MIDDLE against C3 MIDDLE TOWNSHIP LLC, INSA MIDDLE TOWNSHIP, LLC, SWEETSPOT GARDEN STATE LLC | |
December 14, 2022 | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by MONACO, JARED, J of GENOVA BURNS LLC on behalf of SWEETSPOT GARDEN STATE LLC against C3 MIDDLE TOWNSHIP LLC | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge BLEE, MICHAEL, J | |
December 09, 2022 | MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.