Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Robin Graiff, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dante B Parenti, Leonard L Grasso, against Thomas J Spigelmyer, represented by Benjamin B Brenner, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 23, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 28, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 10, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 02, 2022MEDIATION Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT-Denied by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20232936998] | |
November 17, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral Argument has been granted. Remote Re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20232936998] is rescheduled on 11/17/2023 with Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H. You must attend by Video as scheduled. Please contact the court for further details | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20232936998] -CORRECTION: oral argument is scheduled for this Friday, November 17, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom. Please look for an email from case management team with link. | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20232936998] -This matter is scheduled for oral argument this Friday, October 20, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom. Please look for an email from case management team with link. | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION [LCV20233333426] -Other - Discovery End Date has been extended 60 days by consent. | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by BRENNER, BENJAMIN, B of BRENNERLAW LLC on behalf of THOMAS J SPIGELMYER against ROBIN GRAIFF | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-COURT INITIATED - Granted by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H re: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-COURT INITIATED | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral Argument has been granted. The Re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20232936998] to be conducted on paper is rescheduled on 11/17/2023 with Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H. Please contact the court for further details | |
November 03, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.