Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jessica Cabrera Salinas, J H, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by M D Perskie, against Francisco De La O Garcia, John Doe 1-1, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 24, 2023 |
FRIENDLY CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
July 14, 2023 |
FRIENDLY CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: COURT Notice submitted by Case Management on CONSOLIDATED CASE CPM-L -000454-22 | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Friendly Conference" Proceeding for CPM-L-000422-22 scheduled for 07/14/2023 has been: "Adjourned-other Trial/proceeding". | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Friendly Conference" Proceeding for CPM-L-000422-22 has been re-scheduled as a "Friendly Conference" Proceeding for 07/24/2023. | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: ORDER CONSOLIDATE CASES-Granted by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H re: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES LCV20231570876 on CONSOLIDATED CASE CPM-L -000454-22 | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Consolidate Cases - GRANTED by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.