Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Paul John Klemm, against Linda Amjadi, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with Dean R Marcolongo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2022 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment By Default submitted by Court | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT submitted by KLEMM, PAUL, JOHN of RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. against LINDA AMJADI | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by KLEMM, PAUL, JOHN of RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. against LINDA AMJADI | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: LINDA AMJADI | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by DOCKSWELL, JARED of RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. against LINDA AMJADI | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for CPM-L-000410-22 submitted by KLEMM, PAUL JOHN, RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. against LINDA AMJADI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.