Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Edward Comby, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by David Rock Castellani, against Board Of E John Doe Ocean City, Cathy Smith, Henry Rodriguez, Kelly Tim, Ocean City Board Ofeducation, (total of 5) See All represented by Erin Thompson, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2022 |
CategoryLaw Against Discrimination (Lad) Cases |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by THOMPSON, ERIN of BIRCHMEIER & POWELL LLC on behalf of OCEAN CITY BOARD OF EDUCATION, HENRY RODRIGUEZ, CATHY SMITH, KELLY TIM against EDWARD COMBY | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by CASTELLANI, DAVID, ROCK of CASTELLANI LAW FIRM, LLC on behalf of EDWARD COMBY against KELLY TIM | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by CASTELLANI, DAVID, ROCK of CASTELLANI LAW FIRM, LLC on behalf of EDWARD COMBY against CATHY SMITH | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by CASTELLANI, DAVID, ROCK of CASTELLANI LAW FIRM, LLC on behalf of EDWARD COMBY against OCEAN CITY BOARD OF EDUCATION | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by CASTELLANI, DAVID, ROCK of CASTELLANI LAW FIRM, LLC on behalf of EDWARD COMBY against HENRY RODRIGUEZ | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | This case has been transferred from ATL-L-2825-22 to CPM-L-404-22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.