Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Best Line Leasing, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Andrew Bredt Cohen, against Hunt & Son, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT - J [LCV2023326444] -Entered in the Civil Judgment and Order Docket in the Superior Court Clerk's Office. J-009820 23 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT - J submitted by COHEN, ANDREW, BREDT of GERSTEIN GRAYSON & COHEN LLP on behalf of BEST LINE LEASING, INC. against HUNT & SON, LLC | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Entering Default Judgment - GRANTED by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT submitted by COHEN, ANDREW, BREDT of GERSTEIN GRAYSON & COHEN LLP on behalf of BEST LINE LEASING, INC. against HUNT & SON, LLC | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: HUNT & SON, LLC | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by COHEN, ANDREW, BREDT of GERSTEIN GRAYSON & COHEN LLP on behalf of BEST LINE LEASING, INC. against HUNT & SON, LLC | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by COHEN, ANDREW, BREDT of GERSTEIN GRAYSON & COHEN LLP on behalf of BEST LINE LEASING, INC. against HUNT & SON, LLC | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for CPM-L-000386-22 submitted by COHEN, ANDREW BREDT, GERSTEIN GRAYSON & COHEN LLP on behalf of BEST LINE LEASING, INC. against HUNT & SON, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.