Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Progressive Garden State, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stacy F Plotz Maza, against -10 Abc Corporation, John Doe, Shamera D Watkins, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Property Damage |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeSett-Not Sched Trial,Arbitr, Or Othr Cdr/Friend Hear Not Compl |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT submitted by PLOTZ MAZA, STACY, F of JAN MEYER & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY against SHAMERA D WATKINS | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by PLOTZ MAZA, STACY, F of JAN MEYER & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY against SHAMERA D WATKINS | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: ABC CORPORATION(S) 1 -10 | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: JOHN DOE(S) 1-10 | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: SHAMERA D WATKINS | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by PLOTZ MAZA, STACY, F of JAN MEYER & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY against SHAMERA D WATKINS | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for CPM-L-000286-22 submitted by PLOTZ MAZA, STACY F, JAN MEYER & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE against SHAMERA D WATKINS, JOHN DOE(S) 1-10, ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.