Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Leonard Doughty, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Paul Rhodes Duffy, against Kenneth Merritt, Melissa Merritt, represented by Lori Sue Klinger, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with JSC J CHRISTOPHER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2017 |
CategoryTort-Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by KLINGER, LORI, SUE of KENT & MC BRIDE, PC on behalf of KENNETH MERRITT, MELISSA MERRITT against LEONARD DOUGHTY | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY submitted by KLINGER, LORI, SUE of KENT & MC BRIDE, PC on behalf of KENNETH MERRITT, MELISSA MERRITT against LEONARD DOUGHTY | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATION submitted by Case Management | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - GRANTED by Judge J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON, JSC | |
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by LEWIS, MICHAEL, JOSEPH of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE CO on behalf of MELISSA MERRITT, KENNETH MERRITT against LEONARD DOUGHTY | |
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: Answer w/Jury Demand [LCV2017546476] -Default entered on November 8, 2017 against defendants, requires court order to vacate default before answer is filed. | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by LEWIS, MICHAEL, JOSEPH of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE CO on behalf of MELISSA MERRITT, KENNETH MERRITT against LEONARD DOUGHTY | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by DUFFY, PAUL, RHODES of KEARNS DUFFY & VACCARO, PC on behalf of LEONARD DOUGHTY against MELISSA MERRITT, KENNETH MERRITT | |
July 21, 2017 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Judge: JSC J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.