Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Sherry Gannon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Richard John Albuquerque, against Abc Parterships, John Does, Mary Does, New Jersey Manufacturers Insur, Paul Breitinger, (total of 6) See All represented by James Patrick Meissler, Julio Navarro, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeTried To Completion With Jury |
This complaint document consists of multiple pages, with each page labeled as "CPM L 000223-17" and dated "05/22/2017". The document appears to be a transaction identification record, with the transaction ID being "LCV2018758447".
As per the given ...
COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 02, 2019COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 20, 2019COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 11, 2019COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 07, 2019Order Dismissing Complaint - GRANTED by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H
Date: October 01, 2019Court Initiated Correspondence submitted by Court
Date: February 04, 2019Court Initiated Correspondence submitted by Court
Date: September 06, 2019COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 10, 2019COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 12, 2019Arbitration Award submitted by Court
Date: January 17, 2019DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 30, 2018Order To Enter Judgment - GRANTED by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H
Date: September 26, 2019Answer uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by MELISSA BISHOP
Date: July 10, 2017COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 03, 2018DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by MEISSLER, JAMES, PATRICK of LAW OFFICE PAMELA D HARGROVE on behalf of PAUL BREITINGER against SHERRY GANNON, DOES JOHN, NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSURANCE COMPANY, XYZ CORPORATIONS, ABC PARTERSHIPS ET AL. | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Dismissing Complaint - GRANTED by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL submitted by MOORE, CHAD, M of HOAGLAND LONGO MORAN DUNST & DOUKAS on behalf of NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSURANCE COMPANY against SHERRY GANNON, PAUL BREITINGER | |
September 30, 2019 |
TRIAL
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Order To Enter Judgment - GRANTED by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | PRE TRIAL MEMO submitted by NAVARRO, JULIO of HOAGLAND LONGO MORAN DUNST & DOUKAS on behalf of NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSURANCE COMPANY against SHERRY GANNON | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE submitted by NAVARRO, JULIO of HOAGLAND LONGO MORAN DUNST & DOUKAS on behalf of NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSUR against SHERRY GANNON | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 09/16/2019 re: MOTION TO BAR [LCV20191439573] | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | CORRECTION: re: [LCV20191652065] GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by ALBUQUERQUE, RICHARD, JOHN of D'ARCY JOHNSON DAY on behalf of SHERRY GANNON against PAUL BREITINGER, NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSURANCE COMPANY Filing Type has been changed to NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Case Management Staff | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/16/2019 will be decided on 09/16/2019. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION IN LIMINE [LCV20191657820] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.