Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jt Laundry Cm Llc, filed a(n) Summary Action case represented by Adam Busler, Timothy Joseph Bloh, against Desert Sand Resort, represented by Francis Joseph Ballak Jr, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Pickering Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 23, 2023 |
CategorySummary Action |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 08, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Case Management Conference" Proceeding for CPM-L-000207-23 has been scheduled for 08/21/2023. | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by BLOH, TIMOTHY, JOSEPH of FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP on behalf of JT LAUNDRY CM LLC against DESERT SAND RESORT | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY submitted by BLOH, TIMOTHY, JOSEPH of FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP on behalf of JT LAUNDRY CM LLC against DESERT SAND RESORT | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by BLOH, TIMOTHY, JOSEPH of FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP on behalf of JT LAUNDRY CM LLC against DESERT SAND RESORT | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/CounterClaim ,3rd Party Claim submitted by BALLAK JR, FRANCIS, JOSEPH of GOLDENBERG MACKLER SAYEGH ET AL on behalf of DESERT SAND RESORT against JT LAUNDRY CM LLC | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE submitted by WRIGHT, LAUREN, ALAYNE of FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP on behalf of JT LAUNDRY CM LLC against DESERT SAND RESORT | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint for CPM-L-000207-23 submitted by BUSLER, ADAM , FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP on behalf of JT LAUNDRY CM LLC against DESERT SAND RESORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.