Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Monica Fay, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ted Conroy Strickland, against 0 Xyz Corporations 1-1, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, The Tjx Companies, Inc., represented by Lee Harris Eckell, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Pickering Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2023 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by ECKELL, LEE, HARRIS of FOWLER HIRTZEL MCNULTY & SPAULDING LLC on behalf of THE TJX COMPANIES, INC. against MONICA FAY | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20232040157] | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by ECKELL, LEE, HARRIS of FOWLER HIRTZEL MCNULTY & SPAULDING LLC on behalf of THE TJX COMPANIES, INC. against MONICA FAY | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by STRICKLAND, TED, CONROY of PENDER & STRICKLAND, LLC on behalf of MONICA FAY against THE TJX COMPANIES, INC. | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT INQUIRY submitted by STRICKLAND, TED, CONROY of PENDER & STRICKLAND, LLC on behalf of MONICA FAY against THE TJX COMPANIES, INC. | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for CPM-L-000189-23 submitted by STRICKLAND, TED CONROY, PENDER & STRICKLAND, LLC on behalf of MONICA FAY against THE TJX COMPANIES, INC., JOHN DOES 1-10, JANE DOES 1-10, ABC PARTNERSHIPS 1-10, XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.