Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Andrew Olexa, Desirae Anderson, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Lisa Ann Buckalew, against Spinnaker Insurancecompany, represented by Fredric Paul Gallin, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2020 |
CategoryOther Insurance Claim (Including Declaratory Judgment Actions) |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeSettled-While Scheduled For Arbitration |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 28, 2020COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 02, 2021DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 28, 2020COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 09, 2021Letter Memorandum submitted by Court
Date: May 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by GALLIN, FREDRIC, PAUL of METHFESSEL & WERBEL on behalf of SPINNAKER INSURANCE COMPANY against DESIRAE ANDERSON, ANDREW OLEXA | |
September 23, 2021 | ARBITRATION HEARING | ||
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT submitted by BUCKALEW, LISA, ANN of ZENSTEIN KOVALSKY BUCKALEW LLC on behalf of DESIRAE ANDERSON, ANDREW OLEXA against SPINNAKER INSURANCE COMPANY | |
June 10, 2021 | ARBITRATION HEARING | ||
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20211137311] | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20211137311] -Please note - Arbitration date has changed. Arbitration is now scheduled for September 23, 2021. | |
May 28, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by GALLIN, FREDRIC, PAUL of METHFESSEL & WERBEL on behalf of SPINNAKER INSURANCE COMPANY against DESIRAE ANDERSON, ANDREW OLEXA *LINKED FILING* | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20211137311] -The pending Motion to Extend Discovery returnable on May 28 requests 120 days of discovery. Please provide a detailed schedule of all remaining discovery to be completed during that time. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.