Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cape Emergency Physicians, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael S Harrison, against Angelina Sharp, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2017 |
CategoryContract Dispute |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
Case Dism by Rule Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 02, 2017Summons UnServed Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 02, 2017Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Dism by Rule Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons UnServed Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Return Service - Unserved uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ANGELINA SHARP | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Return Service - Served uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ANGELINA SHARP | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event | A Complaint for CPM-DC-001003-17 submitted by HARRISON, MICHAEL S, MICHAEL S. HARRISON on behalf of CAPE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS against ANGELINA SHARP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.