Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Credit Acceptance Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Andrew J Selkow, against Brielle A Conley, Judith A Conley, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2017 |
CategoryContract Dispute |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 04, 2017SIGNED - WRIT OF EXECUTION AGAINST WAGES submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: August 17, 2018Signed Order uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ANDREW J SELKOW
Date: August 03, 2017Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 23, 2017Return Service - Served submitted by Staff
Date: June 16, 2017Execution Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 16, 2017Writ Returned submitted by Court
Date: February 07, 2020Execution Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 18, 2018WRIT OF EXECUTION AGAINST GOODS AND CHATTELS submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: September 19, 2017STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING - DJ submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: December 29, 2020STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: October 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING - DJ submitted by Case Management Staff | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING submitted by Case Management Staff | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DOCKETING submitted by SINCLAIR, KRISTEN, MARY of MORGAN BORNSTEIN & MORGAN on behalf of CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP against BRIELLE A CONLEY, JUDITH A CONLEY | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTION RETURN - PARTIALLY SATISFIED submitted by Court Officer RAYMOND WELSH | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ Returned submitted by Court | |
August 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Execution Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | SIGNED - WRIT OF EXECUTION AGAINST WAGES submitted by Case Management Staff | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WAGE EXECUTION submitted by SELKOW, ANDREW, J of MORGAN BORNSTEIN & MORGAN on behalf of CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP against BRIELLE A CONLEY | |
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION AGAINST GOODS AND CHATTELS submitted by Case Management Staff | |
September 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Execution Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.