Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cape Atlantic Oral And Maxlfcl, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Phillip E Van Embden, against Theresa Beisel, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2017 |
CategoryContract Dispute |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: October 11, 2017STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING - DJ submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: November 02, 2017Judgment Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 30, 2017Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 12, 2017Proof of Service from USPS
Date: May 24, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING - DJ submitted by Case Management Staff | |
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING submitted by Case Management Staff | |
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DOCKETING submitted by VAN EMBDEN, PHILLIP, E of VAN EMBDEN, VAN EMBDEN AND GIORDANO, P.C on behalf of CAPE ATLANTIC ORAL AND MAXLFCL against THERESA BEISEL | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT submitted by VAN EMBDEN, PHILLIP, E of VAN EMBDEN, VAN EMBDEN AND GIORDANO, P.C on behalf of CAPE ATLANTIC ORAL AND MAXLFCL against THERESA BEISEL | |
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service from USPS | |
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | A Complaint for CPM-DC-000918-17 submitted by VAN EMBDEN, PHILLIP E, VAN EMBDEN, VAN EMBDEN AND GIORDANO, P.C on behalf of CAPE ATLANTIC ORAL AND MAXLFCL against THERESA BEISEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.