Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
State Of New Jersey, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Linda C Spence, against 2018 Acura Mdx, 254.00, Eagle Auto Sales, Frank Delgado-Perez, Lupe Perez, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Steven J Polansky presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeInactive Forfeiture |
Final Judgment By Default submitted by Staff
Date: August 10, 2023Final Judgment By Default submitted by Staff
Date: January 24, 2023Answer uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by LUPE PEREZ
Date: October 14, 2022TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: 254.00 | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: 2018 ACURA MDX | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: EAGLE AUTO SALES | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment By Default submitted by Staff | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT submitted by SPENCE, LINDA, C of CAMDEN COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY against 2018 ACURA MDX, EAGLE AUTO SALES | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: EAGLE AUTO SALES | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by SPENCE, LINDA, C of CAMDEN COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY against 2018 ACURA MDX, 254.00, EAGLE AUTO SALES | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTE SERVICE-Granted by Judge POLANSKY, STEVEN, J re: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE [LCV2023950162] | |
April 14, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Judge: STEVEN J POLANSKY |
||
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE submitted by SPENCE, LINDA, C of CAMDEN COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY against 2018 ACURA MDX, EAGLE AUTO SALES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.