Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Paul Steven Kennedy, against Mikal Holden, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Michael J Kassel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J Kassel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Property Damage |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeSett-Not Sched Trial,Arbitr, Or Othr Cdr/Friend Hear Not Compl |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 27, 2020Order Entering Default Judgment - GRANTED by Judge KASSEL, MICHAEL, J
Date: May 10, 2021Affidavit Of Service submitted by Staff
Date: July 09, 2020Order To Enter Judgment - GRANTED by Judge KASSEL, MICHAEL, J
Date: July 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Entering Default Judgment - GRANTED by Judge KASSEL, MICHAEL, J | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: MIKAL HOLDEN | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION submitted by KENNEDY, PAUL, STEVEN of KENNEDY LAW FIRM on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O SHIRLEY BIMBO against MIKAL HOLDEN | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: CERTIFICATION [LCV20211076651] -Other: Please clarify what is being filed. Anne McGinley 856-650-9100 ext. 43145 | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION submitted by KENNEDY, PAUL, STEVEN of KENNEDY LAW FIRM on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O SHIRLEY BIMBO against MIKAL HOLDEN | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Order To Enter Judgment - GRANTED by Judge KASSEL, MICHAEL, J | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT submitted by KENNEDY, PAUL, STEVEN of KENNEDY LAW FIRM on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O SHIRLEY BIMBO against MIKAL HOLDEN | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Service submitted by Staff | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint for CAM-L-001251-20 submitted by KENNEDY, PAUL STEVEN, KENNEDY LAW FIRM on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO against MIKAL HOLDEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.