Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Collins Williams, David Rochman, Esq., Simon & Simon, P.C., filed a(n) Other case represented by David S Rochman, Marc I Simon, against Collin Williams, David Rochan, Simon & Simon, P.C., represented by David S Rochman, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Sherri L Schweitzer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSherri L Schweitzer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2020 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by ROCHMAN, DAVID, S of DAVID S. ROCHMAN on behalf of DAVID ROCHAN, COLLIN WILLIAMS against SIMON & SIMON, P.C. | |
October 24, 2020 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 07, 2020 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer W/CounterClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by ROCHMAN, DAVID, S of DAVID S. ROCHMAN on behalf of DAVID ROCHAN, COLLIN WILLIAMS against SIMON & SIMON, P.C. | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by SIMON, MARC, I of SIMON & SIMON, PC on behalf of SIMON & SIMON, P.C. against COLLIN WILLIAMS | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by SIMON, MARC, I of SIMON & SIMON, PC on behalf of SIMON & SIMON, P.C. against DAVID ROCHAN | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint for CAM-L-001238-20 submitted by SIMON, MARC I, SIMON & SIMON, PC on behalf of SIMON & SIMON, P.C. against COLLIN WILLIAMS, DAVID ROCHAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.