Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Joan E Smeraski, Executor, Joan Smeraski, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Michael Sean Ringold, Stephanie Victoria Shreibman, against , 5) Def Partnerships (1-, Abc Companies, Atria Management Company, Llc, Employee S Cnas And Paramedical, (total of 14) See All represented by Andre J Major, Kelly Jones Howell, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Anthony M Pugliese presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony M Pugliese Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2020 |
CategoryProfessional Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
Order To Refer To Mediator Without Stay - GRANTED by Judge PUGLIESE, ANTHONY, M
Date: September 11, 2020Order Ferreira Conference - GRANTED by Judge PUGLIESE, ANTHONY, M
Date: June 22, 2020TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by HOWELL, KELLY, JONES of HARRIS BEACH PLLC on behalf of RESIDENCE, JANE MOE TECHNICIANS(1-5), CNAS AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-10), JANE DOE NURSES (1-5), JANE MOE TECHNICIANS(1-5) ET AL. against J.SMERASKI AS EXEC. FOR THE EST. OF D.A.MUNSON, EXECUTOR FOR THE ESTATE OF DOLORES A. MUNSON | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT submitted by SHREIBMAN, STEPHANIE, VICTORIA of DANSKY KATZ RINGOLD & YORK PC on behalf of J.SMERASKI AS EXEC. FOR THE EST. OF D.A.MUNSON, EXECUTOR FOR THE ESTATE OF DOLORES A. MUNSON against RESIDENCE, JANE MOE TECHNICIANS(1-5), CNAS AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-10), JANE DOE NURSES (1-5), JANE MOE TECHNICIANS(1-5) ET AL. | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Order To Refer To Mediator Without Stay - GRANTED by Judge PUGLIESE, ANTHONY, M | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATION Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 27, 2020 |
FERREIRA CONFERENCE
Judge: ANTHONY M PUGLIESE |
||
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Ferreira Conference - GRANTED by Judge PUGLIESE, ANTHONY, M | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | FERREIRA CONFERENCE WAIVED submitted by SHREIBMAN, STEPHANIE, VICTORIA of DANSKY KATZ RINGOLD & YORK PC on behalf of J.SMERASKI AS EXEC. FOR THE EST. OF D.A.MUNSON, EXECUTOR FOR THE ESTATE OF DOLORES A. MUNSON against RESIDENCE, JANE MOE TECHNICIANS(1-5), CNAS AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-10), JANE DOE NURSES (1-5), JANE MOE TECHNICIANS(1-5) ET AL. | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by HOWELL, KELLY, JONES of HARRIS BEACH PLLC on behalf of RESIDENCE, JANE MOE TECHNICIANS(1-5), CNAS AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-10), JANE DOE NURSES (1-5), JANE MOE TECHNICIANS(1-5) ET AL. against J.SMERASKI AS EXEC. FOR THE EST. OF D.A.MUNSON, EXECUTOR FOR THE ESTATE OF DOLORES A. MUNSON | |
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by MAJOR, ANDRE, J of HARRIS BEACH PLLC on behalf of RESIDENCE, JANE MOE TECHNICIANS(1-5), CNAS AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-10), JANE DOE NURSES (1-5), JANE MOE TECHNICIANS(1-5) ET AL. against J.SMERASKI AS EXEC. FOR THE EST. OF D.A.MUNSON, EXECUTOR FOR THE ESTATE OF DOLORES A. MUNSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.