Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Robert C Leonard, filed a(n) Lemon Law case represented by Michael D Power, against Ford Motor Company, represented by Paul K Russell, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Yolanda C Rodriguez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYolanda C Rodriguez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2020 |
CategoryLemon Law |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by RUSSELL, PAUL, K of DOBIS RUSSELL & PETERSON, PC on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY against ROBERT C LEONARD | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRECTION: re: [LCV2021450368] STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by POWER, MICHAEL, D of POWER & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of ROBERT C LEONARD against FORD MOTOR COMPANY Filing Type has been changed to STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT by Case Management Staff | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRECTED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by POWER, MICHAEL, D of POWER & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of ROBERT C LEONARD against FORD MOTOR COMPANY | |
February 22, 2021 |
ARBITRATION HEARING
Judge: CAMDEN ARBITRATION |
||
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by RUSSELL, PAUL, K of DOBIS RUSSELL & PETERSON, PC on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY against ROBERT C LEONARD | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by DOBIS, JAMES, S of DOBIS RUSSELL & PETERSON, PC on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY against ROBERT C LEONARD | |
March 21, 2020 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for CAM-L-001200-20 submitted by POWER, MICHAEL D, POWER & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of ROBERT C LEONARD against FORD MOTOR COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.