Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Derrick Lecque, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brandon James Broderick, against Abc Co. 1-10, Denyse Ramcharita, John Doe 1-10, Md K Alam, Omar K Ramcharita-Dillon, (total of 9) See All represented by Candace Renee Johnson, Evan J Camhi, Harold David West, Madeline Sophia Baio, in the jurisdiction of Bergen County, NJ, . Bergen County, NJ Superior Courts with Michael N Beukas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBergen County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: December 04, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY-Denied by Judge BEUKAS, MICHAEL, N re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20232974943] | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER-Denied by Judge BEUKAS, MICHAEL, N re: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER [LCV20233367578] | |
December 15, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Judge: MICHAEL N BEUKAS |
||
December 15, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STAY CASE
Judge: MICHAEL N BEUKAS |
||
December 15, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: MICHAEL N BEUKAS |
||
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE submitted by BAIO, MADELINE, SOPHIA of VAUGHAN BAIO & PARTNERS on behalf of UBER, UBER TECHNOLOGIES LLC, RASIER LLC against DERRICK LECQUE | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by PAGANI, BIANCA, NICOLE of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of DERRICK LECQUE against OMAR K RAMCHARITA-DILLON, DENYSE RAMCHARITA, MD K ALAM, VENTURE LEASING LLC, UBER ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by WEST, HAROLD, DAVID of PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE CO on behalf of OMAR K RAMCHARITA-DILLON, DENYSE RAMCHARITA against DERRICK LECQUE, MD K ALAM, VENTURE LEASING LLC, UBER, UBER TECHNOLOGIES LLC ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by WEST, HAROLD, DAVID of PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE CO on behalf of OMAR K RAMCHARITA-DILLON, DENYSE RAMCHARITA against MD K ALAM, VENTURE LEASING LLC, UBER, UBER TECHNOLOGIES LLC, RASIER LLC ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: MOTION TO STAY CASE [LCV20233337873] -After further review of same by Chambers, the application should have been done by OTSC as a summary action, pursuant to NJSA 2A:23B-7, rather than by a motion. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.