Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lebert Jevaughn Vs Hernandez Pena Jose
An Auto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Bergen County, NJ. Judge Mary F Thurber presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 01, 2023
Last Refreshed
March 26, 2024
Filing Location
Bergen County, NJ
Category
Auto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Open
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Jevaughn Lebert against defendants Jose J. Hernandez Pena, Jasmeet Singh, Brinderjit Singh, Lyft, Travelers Insurance Company, American Transit Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, John Does 1-10, a…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Dec 25, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Nov 18, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Oct 30, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Jul 15, 2023Summons uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by BRINDERJIT SINGH
Date: Jun 05, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Feb 02, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT
Judge: MARY F THURBER |
||
March 15, 2024 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT
Judge: MARY F THURBER |
||
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE *LINKED FILING* | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by GALE, EVERETT, EDWIN of MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE against JEVAUGHN LEBERT | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/23/2024 was rescheduled to 03/28/2024. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV2024481778] | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) submitted by NOLAN, MICHELLE, ANN of KELLY & MILLER LLC on behalf of JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH against JEVAUGHN LEBERT *LINKED FILING* | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT, INC., TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/23/2024 will be decided on 03/15/2024. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV2024481778] | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT, INC., TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL. | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge THURBER, MARY, F re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV202424119] | |
January 19, 2024 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: MARY F THURBER |
||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER TO STAY CASE-Partial by Judge THURBER, MARY, F re: MOTION TO STAY CASE [LCV20233537059] | |
January 05, 2024 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STAY CASE
Judge: MARY F THURBER |
||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/03/2024 will be decided on 01/19/2024. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV202424119] | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY submitted by GALE, EVERETT, EDWIN of MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE against JEVAUGHN LEBERT | |
December 25, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 12/05/2023 was rescheduled to 01/05/2024. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO STAY CASE [LCV20233537059] | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT, INC., TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL. | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STAY CASE submitted by SANCHEZ, DOUGLAS, V of CRUSER, MITCHELL, NOVITZ, SANCHEZ, GASTON & ZIMET, LLP on behalf of LYFT, INC. against JEVAUGHN LEBERT | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 12/05/2023 will be decided on 01/05/2024. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO STAY CASE [LCV20233537059] | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: AMERICAN TRANSIT INS URANCE CO | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against AMERICAN TRANSIT INSURANCE CO | |
November 18, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by GALE, EVERETT, EDWIN of MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE against JEVAUGHN LEBERT, JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT, INC. ET AL. | |
November 03, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: MARY F THURBER |
||
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by PUPPELO, MICHAEL, ANTHONY of GEICO INSURANCE on behalf of JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA against JEVAUGHN LEBERT, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT, INC., TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL. | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against LYFT, INC. *LINKED FILING* | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 10/20/2023 re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20233009103] | |
October 20, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: MARY F THURBER |
||
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by SANCHEZ, DOUGLAS, V of CRUSER, MITCHELL, NOVITZ, SANCHEZ, GASTON & ZIMET, LLP on behalf of LYFT, INC. against JEVAUGHN LEBERT *LINKED FILING* | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/02/2023 was rescheduled to 11/03/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20233009103] | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) submitted by SANCHEZ, DOUGLAS, V of CRUSER, MITCHELL, NOVITZ, SANCHEZ, GASTON & ZIMET, LLP on behalf of LYFT, INC. against JEVAUGHN LEBERT *LINKED FILING* | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/02/2023 will be decided on 10/20/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20233009103] | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against LYFT, INC. *LINKED FILING* | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against LYFT, INC. | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by KELLY, MICHAEL, BRUCE of KELLY & MILLER LLC on behalf of JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH against JEVAUGHN LEBERT | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer submitted by COYNE, JOHN, THOMAS of MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE against JEVAUGHN LEBERT | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge THURBER, MARY, F re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20232219962] | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | OFFER OF JUDGMENT submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by KELLY, MICHAEL, BRUCE of KELLY & MILLER LLC on behalf of JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH against JEVAUGHN LEBERT | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY | |
July 15, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FIRST PLEADING submitted by COYNE, JOHN, THOMAS of MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE against JEVAUGHN LEBERT | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by BRODERICK, BRANDON, JAMES of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT, INC., TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL. | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by BRODERICK, BRANDON, JAMES of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT, INC. | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by BRINDERJIT SINGH | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT, INC., TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL. | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT-Granted by Judge THURBER, MARY, F re: MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV20231400495] | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: Answer w/Jury Demand [LCV20231644415] -Please be advised your collateral account has been charged $250 for the crossclaim in your answer. | |
May 26, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT
Judge: MARY F THURBER |
||
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by SANCHEZ, DOUGLAS, V of CRUSER, MITCHELL, NOVITZ, SANCHEZ, GASTON & ZIMET, LLP on behalf of LYFT, INC. against JEVAUGHN LEBERT | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by BRODERICK, BRANDON, JAMES of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge THURBER, MARY, F re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20231478759] | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge THURBER, MARY, F re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20231478810] | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by SANCHEZ, DOUGLAS, V of CRUSER, MITCHELL, NOVITZ, SANCHEZ, GASTON & ZIMET, LLP on behalf of LYFT against JEVAUGHN LEBERT | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by SANCHEZ, DOUGLAS, V of CRUSER, MITCHELL, NOVITZ, SANCHEZ, GASTON & ZIMET, LLP on behalf of TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY against JEVAUGHN LEBERT | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: LYFT | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: BRINDERJI SINGH | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: JASMEET SINGH | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JASMEET SINGH, LYFT, TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT submitted by LEHRER, LISA, ANN of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT, TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL. | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/28/2023 will be decided on 05/26/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV20231400495] | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by PUPPELO, MICHAEL, ANTHONY of GEICO INSURANCE on behalf of JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA against JEVAUGHN LEBERT | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by BRODERICK, BRANDON, JAMES of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT, TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL. | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by BRODERICK, BRANDON, JAMES of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT, TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL. | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by BRODERICK, BRANDON, JAMES of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by BRODERICK, BRANDON, JAMES of BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJIT SINGH, LYFT, TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL. | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for BER-L-000625-23 submitted by BRODERICK, BRANDON JAMES, BRANDON J. BRODERICK, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JEVAUGHN LEBERT against JOSE J HERNANDEZ PENA, JASMEET SINGH, BRINDERJI SINGH, LYFT, TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL. |