Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Frederick Carty, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nancy Ann Valentino, against Catherine Biel, T & L Transportation, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Atlantic County, NJ, . Atlantic County, NJ Superior Courts with Danielle J Walcoff presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAtlantic County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 13, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 11, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 11, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by VALENTINO, NANCY, ANN of NANCY A. VALENTINO on behalf of FREDERICK CARTY against CATHERINE BIEL, T & L TRANSPORTATION, INC | |
September 24, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for ATL-L-002620-22 submitted by VALENTINO, NANCY ANN, NANCY A. VALENTINO on behalf of FREDERICK CARTY against CATHERINE BIEL, T & L TRANSPORTATION, INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.