Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jessica Vassallo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Richard John Albuquerque, against Abc Partnerships, John Does, Julian Jackson, Mary Does, Xyz Corporations, (total of 5) See All represented by Joseph Aloysuis Lowe, in the jurisdiction of Atlantic County, NJ, . Atlantic County, NJ Superior Courts with Stanley L Bergman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStanley L Bergman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAtlantic County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 19, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by ALBUQUERQUE, RICHARD, JOHN of D'ARCY JOHNSON DAY on behalf of JESSICA VASSALLO against JULIAN JACKSON, JOHN DOES, MARY DOES, ABC PARTNERSHIPS, XYZ CORPORATIONS | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION [LCV20232050718] -Request has been granted. New discovery end date is October 23, 2023. Further discovery extension will require filing of motion. | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO REINSTATE ANSWER AND SEPARATE DEFENSES-Granted by Judge BERGMAN, STANLEY, L re: MOTION TO REINSTATE ANSWER AND SEPARATE DEFENSES [LCV20231518693] | |
June 09, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO REINSTATE ANSWER AND SEPARATE DEFENSES
Judge: STANLEY L BERGMAN |
||
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | OFFER OF JUDGMENT submitted by ALBUQUERQUE, RICHARD, JOHN of D'ARCY JOHNSON DAY on behalf of JESSICA VASSALLO against JULIAN JACKSON, JOHN DOES, MARY DOES, ABC PARTNERSHIPS, XYZ CORPORATIONS | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO REINSTATE ANSWER AND SEPARATE DEFENSES submitted by LOWE, JOSEPH, ALOYSUIS of CSAA INSURANCE GROUP on behalf of JULIAN JACKSON against JESSICA VASSALLO | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/11/2023 will be decided on 06/09/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO REINSTATE ANSWER AND SEPARATE DEFENSES [LCV20231518693] | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO STRIKE ANSWER-Granted by Judge BERGMAN, STANLEY, L re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER OR MOTION TO STRIKE OR SUPPRESS ANSWER [LCV20231028443] | |
April 14, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER OR MOTION TO STRIKE OR SUPPRESS ANSWER
Judge: STANLEY L BERGMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.