Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Maria Molina, Raul Molina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert A Stacchini, against Abc, Eastern Warehouse Distrib. Llc, John Does, Mark Sheffield, Xyz, (total of 5) See All represented by Jill Lynn Teague, in the jurisdiction of Atlantic County, NJ, . Atlantic County, NJ Superior Courts with Stanley L Bergman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStanley L Bergman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAtlantic County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 12, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by TEAGUE, JILL, LYNN of CHARLES A LITTLE JR on behalf of MARK SHEFFIELD, EASTERN WAREHOUSE DISTRIB. LLC against MARIA MOLINA, RAUL MOLINA | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by TEAGUE, JILL, LYNN of CHARLES A LITTLE JR on behalf of MARK SHEFFIELD, EASTERN WAREHOUSE DISTRIB. LLC against MARIA MOLINA | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by STACCHINI, ROBERT, A of GOLDENBERG MACKLER SAYEGH ET AL on behalf of MARIA MOLINA, RAUL MOLINA against EASTERN WAREHOUSE DISTRIB. LLC | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by STACCHINI, ROBERT, A of GOLDENBERG MACKLER SAYEGH ET AL on behalf of MARIA MOLINA, RAUL MOLINA against MARK SHEFFIELD | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by STACCHINI, ROBERT, A of GOLDENBERG MACKLER SAYEGH ET AL on behalf of MARIA MOLINA, RAUL MOLINA against EASTERN WAREHOUSE DISTRIB. LLC | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [LCV20223558873] -While serving outside of NJ you must file a affidavit of diligent inquiry | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for ATL-L-002559-22 submitted by STACCHINI, ROBERT A, GOLDENBERG MACKLER SAYEGH ET AL on behalf of MARIA MOLINA, RAUL MOLINA against MARK SHEFFIELD, EASTERN WAREHOUSE DISTRIB. LLC, JOHN DOES, ABC, XYZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.