Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nella M Bethea, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kelli Prinz, against Abc Partnerships, Charles S Senack, John Doe, Mary Doe, Xyz Corporations, (total of 5) See All represented by James D Blumenthal, in the jurisdiction of Atlantic County, NJ, . Atlantic County, NJ Superior Courts with John C Porto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn C Porto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAtlantic County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 17, 2022DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 22, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by BLUMENTHAL, JAMES, D of BENNETT BRICKLIN & SALTZBURG, LLC on behalf of CHARLES S SENACK against NELLA M BETHEA, JOHN DOE, MARY DOE, ABC PARTNERSHIPS, XYZ CORPORATIONS | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by BLUMENTHAL, JAMES, D of BENNETT BRICKLIN & SALTZBURG, LLC on behalf of CHARLES S SENACK against NELLA M BETHEA | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by PRINZ, KELLI of D'ARCY JOHNSON DAY on behalf of NELLA M BETHEA against CHARLES S SENACK, JOHN DOE, MARY DOE, ABC PARTNERSHIPS, XYZ CORPORATIONS | |
September 17, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for ATL-L-002538-22 submitted by PRINZ, KELLI , D'ARCY JOHNSON DAY on behalf of NELLA M BETHEA against CHARLES S SENACK, JOHN DOE, MARY DOE, ABC PARTNERSHIPS, XYZ CORPORATIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.