Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Paul Dalnoky, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Ess, represented by Ashley Lauren Toth, in the jurisdiction of Atlantic County, NJ, . Atlantic County, NJ Superior Courts with Danielle J Walcoff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDanielle J Walcoff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 02, 2023 |
CategoryEmployment (Other Than Cepa Or Lad) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAtlantic County, NJ |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Outcome TypeReinstated |
This complaint alleges that the defendant, ESS, interfered with a contract between the plaintiff, Paul B Dalnoky, and the Atlantic City School District, resulting in the termination of the plaintiff's services as a substitute teacher. The plaintiff c...
Motion Dismissing Complaint uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ASHLEY LAUREN TOTH
Date: November 22, 2023Order Dismissing Complaint - GRANTED by Judge SHEPPARD, M SUSAN
Date: January 05, 2024Complaint uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PAUL DALNOKY
Date: October 02, 2023Amended Complaint uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PAUL DALNOKY
Date: February 02, 2024Opposition To Motion uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ASHLEY LAUREN TOTH
Date: December 26, 2023Opposition To Motion uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PAUL DALNOKY
Date: December 26, 2023Proof Of Service uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PAUL DALNOKY
Date: November 02, 2023Order To Transfer To Another Court - GRANTED by Judge SHEPPARD, M SUSAN
Date: February 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Order To Transfer To Another Court - GRANTED by Judge SHEPPARD, M SUSAN | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PAUL DALNOKY | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Dismissing Complaint - GRANTED by Judge SHEPPARD, M SUSAN | |
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition To Motion uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ASHLEY LAUREN TOTH | |
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition To Motion uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PAUL DALNOKY | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Cross Motion To Dismiss Complaint, Failure To State Claim uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PAUL DALNOKY | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Dismissing Complaint uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ASHLEY LAUREN TOTH | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Appearance - First Pleading uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by ASHLEY LAUREN TOTH | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof Of Service uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PAUL DALNOKY | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PAUL DALNOKY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.