Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
And On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situtated, Cannon, Shauntay, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Samuel A Wong, against Ams Restaurants, Llc, Does 1-20, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Lauri A. Damrell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Order - Other (Notice of CMC and Orders RE: Complex CMC Procedures) filed.
Date: December 21, 2022Summons filed.
Date: November 23, 2022Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.
Date: December 15, 2022Answer filed.
Date: January 25, 2023Complaint filed.
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: December 30, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.