Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
And On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, Gutierrez, Eva Cano, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Samuel A Wong, against Dignity Health Connected Living, Does 1-20, Rush Personnel Services, Inc., Shasta County Private Industry Council, represented by Hilary A Habib, Mark A Vegh, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Lauri A. Damrell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Complex Case Management Procedures) filed.
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 01/19/2022 10:35:00 AM .
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 05/27/2022 10:00:00 AM .
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO of Motion to Transfer Venue) filed.
Date: July 21, 2022Minutes finalized for heard on 04/18/2022 08:34:00 AM .
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First) filed.
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Proposed Order filed.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Amended Answer filed.
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00General Denial filed.
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Motion to Transfer Venue) filed.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Summons (to First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 05/27/2022 10:00:00 AM published .
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Hilary A. Habib ISO Motion to Transfer Venue) filed.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Wendy Zanotelli ISO Motion to Transfer Venue) filed.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue filed.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Case file contents transferred to receiving court Shasta pursuant to court order . .
Date: November 08, 2022Stipulation Only - Other (Joint Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference) filed.
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Dena Platz ISO Motion to Transfer Venue) filed.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.