Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Individually And On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, Tanis, Susan, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Timothy B Del Castillo, against Does 1-20, Gabriel Jacob, M.D., A Medical Corporation, Laser Eye Care Of California, Llc, represented by Derrick Lam, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Donald J. Currier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: January 12, 2022Proof of Service filed.
Date: February 22, 2022Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 01/28/2022 10:00:00 AM .
Date: January 28, 2022Summons filed.
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (for Leave to File 1st Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: February 22, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: January 28, 2022Answer (To Complaint) filed.
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.