Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Stop Qip Tax Coalition, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against California Department Of Food And Agriculture, Does 1-100, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with James P. Arguelles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P. Arguelles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Declaration - Other (of Brian Danitz in Support of Ex Parte Application to Intervene) filed.
Date: September 29, 2020Order - Other (Order Granting Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Intervene) filed.
Date: September 29, 2020Ex Parte Application - Other (Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Intervene) filed.
Date: September 29, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Ex Parte Application to Intervene) filed.
Date: September 29, 2020Notice of Entry of Order (Granting Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Intervene) filed.
Date: October 06, 2020Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Case initiation form printed .
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: October 23, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.