Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wooton, Dianne, Millirons, Kiona, Clark, Kelly, filed a(n) Civil case against Sacramento Police Department, Sacramento County District Attorneys Office, City Of Sacramento, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Laurie M. Earl presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Re: John McNulty) filed.
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Affidavit - Other (Verification of Plaintiff to Complaint & Petition) filed.
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Order - Other (Recusal Pursuant to CCP 170.1(a)(6)(A)(i)) filed.
Date: August 07, 2020Answer (to Petition) filed.
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Re: Len Kamdang) filed.
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Re: James E Miller) filed.
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Re: Anna Boltyanskiy) filed.
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Re: Molly Thomas-Jensen) filed.
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Re: Darren Laverne) filed.
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Case initiation form printed .
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: August 10, 2020Minutes finalized for heard on 08/10/2020 09:02:00 AM .
Date: August 10, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.