Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Quintero, Adrian, filed a(n) (Writ - Administrative Mandamus) case against California State Personnel Board, represented by Vasilios S Spyridakis, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2020 |
Category(Writ - Administrative Mandamus) |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: January 10, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 10, 2020Answer
Date: February 07, 2020Notice on Writ Petition
Date: March 16, 2020Proposed Judgment
Date: October 28, 2020Correspondence Re: Lodging Administrative Record
Date: August 21, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: November 06, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 05, 2023Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 29, 2020Tentative Ruling
Date: September 14, 2020Judgment
Date: October 29, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 15, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Substitute - on Petition
Date: February 25, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: May 07, 2020Order Order and Notice Reassigning Case
Date: January 15, 2020Order Notice of Related Cases; Notice of Reassignment
Date: April 05, 2023Guide to the Procedure for Prosecuting Writs
Date: January 10, 2020Minute Order
Date: May 07, 2020Correspondence Letter Re: Service of Proposed Judgment
Date: October 29, 2020Order Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: September 17, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 17, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 30, 2020Quintero v. California State Personnel Board - Petition
Date: September 14, 2020Judgment filed.
Date: October 29, 2020Proposed Judgment filed.
Date: October 28, 2020Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: January 10, 2020Tentative Ruling Filed
Date: September 14, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: November 06, 2020Proof of Service (Substitute - on Petition) filed.
Date: February 25, 2020Correspondence (Letter Re: Service of Proposed Judgment) filed.
Date: October 29, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: April 05, 2023Order After Hearing (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: September 17, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: September 29, 2020Answer filed.
Date: February 07, 2020Minutes finalized for heard on 05/07/2020 01:25:00 PM .
Date: May 07, 2020Order - Other (Order and Notice Reassigning Case) filed.
Date: January 15, 2020Correspondence (Re: Lodging Administrative Record) filed.
Date: August 21, 2020Case initiation form printed .
Date: January 10, 2020Order - Other (Notice of Related Cases; Notice of Reassignment) filed.
Date: April 05, 2023Notice of Hearing (on Writ Petition) filed.
Date: March 16, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: September 17, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: May 07, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: January 10, 2020Proposed Order filed.
Date: September 30, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.