Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Potter, Howard H., filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Neal, Randall Monty, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: January 21, 2020Minute Order 2-14-2020
Date: February 14, 2020Restraining Order After Hearing To Stop Harassment (Permanent Order) filed.
Date: February 14, 2020Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed.
Date: January 22, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: February 26, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: February 04, 2020Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed.
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: January 24, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.