Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Martynyuk, Nazar, Timchuk, Marina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Edward A Schade, against Does 1-25, Love, Lisa, Radmand, Melissa, represented by Jacklyn M Sueyres, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Answer (to Complaint) filed.
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: December 01, 2021Case Management Statement filed.
Date: December 17, 2021Minutes finalized for heard on 12/01/2021 09:00:00 AM .
Date: December 01, 2021Case Management Statement filed.
Date: December 16, 2021Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.