Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lemasters, Charlene, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by David Bishop, James E Yee, against Eskaton Properties Incorporated, Does 1-150, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Motion - Other submitted by Lemasters, Charlene rejected on 08/05/2020 .
Date: August 05, 2020Complaint filed.
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: July 08, 2020Summons filed.
Date: June 17, 2020Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: July 10, 2020Association of Attorney filed.
Date: July 27, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.