Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Navarro, Daniel, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed.
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name filed.
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 05/07/2020 10:55:00 AM .
Date: May 07, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: May 07, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Proof of Publication filed.
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Decree Changing Name filed.
Date: June 03, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.