Moya, Pearl,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
Prescott W Littlefield,
against
Rahim, Farzana,
Paramount Tax Relief, Inc.,
Does 1-50,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Details for
Moya, Pearl v. Rahim, Farzana
, et al.
Case Events for
Moya, Pearl v. Rahim, Farzana
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
June 15, 2020
Docket Event
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
May 27, 2020
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/30/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: Thadd A. Blizzard
May 27, 2020
Docket Event
Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
May 11, 2020
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal filed.
May 11, 2020
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
May 11, 2020
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
January 31, 2020
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/30/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .