Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tarabochia, Michael, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Justin C Lowenthal, against Sharma, Gyan, Does 1 To 25, Bps Legacy, Bhakta, Jignesh, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Amended Complaint (First) filed.
Date: March 10, 2020Stipulation submitted by Tarabochia, Michael rejected on 05/28/2020 .
Date: May 28, 2020Complaint filed.
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: July 10, 2020Summons filed.
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: March 06, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 28, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: March 06, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: February 28, 2020Notice of Pendency of Action filed.
Date: January 30, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.