Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ranger, Monica, On Behalf Of Those Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Darren Guez, against Shared Imaging, Does 1-100, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.
Date: January 30, 2020Complaint filed.
Date: January 21, 2020Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed.
Date: February 21, 2020Notice of Case Management and Complex Case Management Procedures
Date: March 03, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: January 21, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: January 30, 2020Summons filed.
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.