Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, Trujillo, Anthony, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Kent L Bradbury, against Does 1-20, Valet Living, Llc. A Delaware Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David De Alba presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid De Alba Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Order - Other (Ordr Granting Stipulation for Leave to File First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First) filed.
Date: June 10, 2020Answer (to Complaint) filed.
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (for Leave to File First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management and Complex Case Management Procedures
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 04/24/2020 01:53:00 PM .
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: June 16, 2020Minutes finalized for heard on 06/16/2020 12:30:00 PM .
Date: June 16, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.