Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Leighty, Robert Don, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Diana L Thomas, against Does 1-10, Diaz-Herrera, Alberto Cruz, Diaz, Martha, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed.
Date: March 12, 2020Complaint filed.
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed.
Date: March 09, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 24, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 30, 2020Summons filed.
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.