Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brown, Renee, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Scott R. Ashton, against Does 1-25, Spangler, Dorothy Mae, Spangler, Richard L., represented by Beth Hurley, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Complaint filed.
Date: January 14, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 15, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 25, 2020General Denial filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: March 10, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: May 08, 2020Summons filed.
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.