Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Department Stores National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Donna M Aguirre, against Richards, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Motion) filed.
Date: June 15, 2020Complaint filed.
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Statement of Case filed.
Date: February 25, 2020Summons filed.
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: February 25, 2020Declaration - Other (Non-Active Military Status) filed.
Date: February 25, 2020Motion to Vacate (Default and Judgment) filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 05/27/2020 02:00:00 PM .
Date: May 27, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: May 27, 2020Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.