Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Quinonezcifuentes, Angel, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Matthew D Engebretson, against Does 1-20, David Lawrence Seals, City Of Sacramento, represented by Susana Alcala Wood, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Answer (To Complaint) filed.
Date: January 27, 2020Complaint filed.
Date: December 26, 2019Summons filed.
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: January 13, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: February 13, 2020Notice of Related Case filed.
Date: January 27, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.