Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alta Sunrise Devco, Llc A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kirk E Giberson, against Does 1-20, Gallo, Marlen, Gallo, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time32 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: December 27, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: January 28, 2020Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed.
Date: January 28, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: January 08, 2020Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: January 24, 2020Summons filed.
Date: January 10, 2020Default denied as to Gallo, Raymond; Gallo, Marlen on Complaint .
Date: January 24, 2020Default denied as to Gallo, Raymond; Gallo, Marlen on Complaint .
Date: January 09, 2020Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: January 08, 2020Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed.
Date: January 08, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.