Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lubin, Nancy, Lubin, Neil, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jonathan R Hayes, against Does 1-10, Latino Center Of Art And Culture, Rodriguez, Richard C., represented by Marc C Gessford, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Complaint filed.
Date: December 17, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 03, 2020Answer filed.
Date: March 09, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: March 16, 2020Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: March 09, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.