Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Anthony Dipiero, against Strickland, Nicole, represented by Stanley R Apps, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions171 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Stipulation filed.
Date: February 24, 2020Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: November 08, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: October 08, 2019Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: February 24, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: September 24, 2019Summons filed.
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.